+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 349 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB234ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983814747
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor