+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB233ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 008937924-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 008937924-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 008937924-H1
- Read second time
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (23-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 008426548-S1
- Passed by temporarily
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 008426548-S1
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 008426548-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 002899548
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: Reported from Finance with sub (23-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor