+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0341)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 341 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB232ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB232S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 080283272-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 080283272-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086597272
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2008: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor