+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB230ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Delegate Griffith agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084624272
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2008: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor