+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 800 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB228ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (94-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (27-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 11-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063245148
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N)
February 17, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: VOTE: (27-Y 11-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor