+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB227E
- Printed as engrossed 14100393D-E
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100393D