+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 392 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB226ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
- Passed House with amendment (90-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (21-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 040864104-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB226E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 040864104
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
February 19, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amd (21-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amds (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor