+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985384700
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor