+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 806 (effective 7/1/12)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB22ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB22ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12103039D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB22E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103039D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2012: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor