+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB218ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18104926D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB218S1
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18104926D-S1
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103185D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources