+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB216ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/22)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB216ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB216S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105346D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22105346D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101873D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor