+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Labor and Commerce
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N)
On December 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102858D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N)
January 13, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
David R. Suetterlein
Type:
Primary Sponsor