+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP1287)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1287)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1287 (effective 7/1/20)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 22, 2020
- Communicated to Governor
- Passed by for the day
- Amendments specific and severable (20-Y 19-N)
On April 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 20110070D-S1
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB215ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20101821D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB215E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
On December 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101821D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 2020: Amendments specific and severable (20-Y 19-N)
March 5, 2020: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
David R. Suetterlein
Type:
Primary Sponsor