+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB215ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 22102212D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB215E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102212D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor