+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
On March 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB215ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (93-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB215E
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendments by Senator Edwards agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Printed as engrossed 082006228-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082006228
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
February 22, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2008: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor