+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 180 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB214ER)
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor