+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (23-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985404739-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985404739-S1
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985404739-S1
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985339739
- Referred to Committee on Finance