+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 586 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB209ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 8-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
On December 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102142D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2020: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N)
February 24, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N)
February 5, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
J. Chapman Petersen
Type:
Primary Sponsor