+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1008)
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB208ER2)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1008 (effective 7/1/04)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 040608800-S2
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB208ER)
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 040604388-S1
On March 13, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Quayle, Howell, Cuccinelli
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Marrs, Reese, Ware, O.
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (3-Y 37-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB208H2
- Substitute by Del. Kilgore agreed to 040598372-H2
- Floor substitute printed 040598372-H2 (Kilgore)
- Committee substitute rejected 040592800-H1
- Read third time
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 040592800-H1
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 043529800-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB208E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 043529800
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 21, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2004: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 13, 2004: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2004: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (3-Y 37-N)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor