+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB207ER)
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Massie, McClellan
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senators: Houck, Miller J.C., Edwards
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 34-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105611D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB207H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105611D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105155D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB207S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10105155D-S1
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: FOIA/Conflict of Interest
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103571D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
March 13, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 13, 2010: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 34-N)
February 26, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor