+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/00)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB207ER)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 005033254
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2000: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2000: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor