+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB206E
- Printed as engrossed 20100880D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On December 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100880D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
J. Chapman Petersen
Type:
Primary Sponsor