+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB206ES1
- Printed as engrossed 14103504D-ES1
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103504D-S1
- Read second time
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB527
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14103504D-S1
On January 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100583D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor