+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB206ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. McDonnell agreed to
- Committee amendment rejected
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor