+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
On March 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB203ER)
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066610114
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor