+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Ebbin agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB202E
- Printed as engrossed 18100785D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N)
On January 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100785D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology