+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/10)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB201ER2)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB201ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 10105806D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105806D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB201H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105806D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105077D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB201S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105077D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102818D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2010: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor