+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB201ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD1692817 (SB201E)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amd. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor