+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
On March 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB200ER)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 044464808
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2004: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2004: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor