+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 821 (effective 7/1/94)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 1-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB2ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed LD3571180 (SB2H1)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 10-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute
- Substitute by Del. Croshaw agreed to
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Motion to recommit to committee rejected
- Amendments by Sen. Marye agreed to #1 & #2
- Amendment by Sen. Marye rejected #3
- Amendment by Sen. Calhoun agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute/w amdts.
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 12-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD7190681 (SB2ES1)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7190681 (SB2S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/08/93
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
March 7, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 12-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor