+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB199ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 988459727-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988459727-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 988459727-H1
- Read second time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984430727-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law/Procedure
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 984430727
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor