+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 434 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB198ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101681D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology