+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB197ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 5, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 005681568-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (14-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Printing on hold - awaiting fiscal impact statement
- Presented & ordered printed 005681568
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2000: Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor