+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0126)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 126 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB197ER)
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (38-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 961474845
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1996: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor