+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 233 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB197ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 18107153D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Passed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB197H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107153D-H1
- Read third time
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18107153D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 18102102D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB197E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102102D
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 15, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor