+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0937)
On May 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 937 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 55-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (40-Y 55-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB193ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time
- Read third time
- Passed House (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 068830848
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 55-N)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor