+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 74 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB191ER)
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 020611716-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 020611716
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2002: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor