+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB190ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N 1-A)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments (65-Y 29-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 29-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104723D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB190ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Printed as engrossed 16104723D-ES1
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 16104723D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101491D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
March 3, 2016: House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
March 3, 2016: House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N 1-A)
March 1, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 29-N)
February 26, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
February 18, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
February 11, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor