+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Continued to 1995 in C. C. T.
- Rereferred to Counties, Cities and Towns
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amemdment (18-Y 4-N)
- Read second time
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD0948661 (SB19E)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed