+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (21-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (9-Y 6-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (21-Y 18-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Finance (9-Y 6-N)
February 2, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor