+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Left in Transportation
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Rereferred to Transportation
- VOTE: --- AGREE TO (50-Y 43-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (50-Y 43-N)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 083850240-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: 1
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB186S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 083522240-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 083522240-S1
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083488240
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2008: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (50-Y 43-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N)
January 28, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor