+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 721 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB184ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N 1-A)
- Passed House (84-Y 14-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing (Suit)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063703796
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N 1-A)
February 28, 2006: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor