+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105986D-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Stanley agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB181ES1
- Printed as engrossed 18105986D-ES1
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 18105986D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
- Incorporates SB148 (Edwards)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101254D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (6)
February 9, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
February 8, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (0-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
January 17, 2018: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor