+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chair votes No
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 19-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 3-N)
On January 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102126D
+ − Votes (5)
January 29, 2014: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
January 29, 2014: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 19-N)
January 24, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor