+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 142 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB180ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 081709866-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB180E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081709866
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor