+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB179ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 18103842D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB179E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103842D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor