+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 691 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1781ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 19104092D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N)
February 14, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor