+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left in Education and Health
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Education and Health
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1778S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106131D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106131D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 19104585D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor