+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by C. J. (22-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
On January 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 1994: Stricken from docket by C. J. (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor