+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 668 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB176ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 021088260